Senate
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 197, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 197, on 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Lamosao, Aiu, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 11:05AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 9:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Nakashima, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Aiu, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; DeCoite Co-Chair; Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 550).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 334) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2817) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2568) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:32PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|