House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 335) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|