House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WAL/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 336) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3060) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-24 9:50AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET/WTL deferred the measure until 02-15-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|