House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 48) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from TCA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2900) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kim.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on EET deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to TCA/EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|