|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 03-17-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|