Senate | 02/02/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |