12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to WTL/TCA, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |