12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |