|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 195) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Elefante, Inouye, McKelvey, Moriwaki, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 749) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|