12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Re-Referred to TCA, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to TCA, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |