|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:31AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|