Senate | 02/15/2024 | Re-Referred to HHS/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HHS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2463) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HHS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS will hold a public decision making on 02-12-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |