House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-24 9:15AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Re-Referred to LBT, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2195) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Kidani, Lee, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-06-24 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|