12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS/HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |