12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237). | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | One Day Notice 03-07-23. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |