12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:36AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-10-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |