Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
|
|
|
House
|
07/03/2024
|
Act 169, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pierick.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:36AM; CR 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 698).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2077), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Lee, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EET, WAM .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|