|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1314), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-16-23 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 78) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Dela Cruz, Fevella, Ihara, Kanuha, Keith-Agaran, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, San Buenaventura, Shimabukuro. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to WTL, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|