House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, Aquino Co-Chairs; Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Kapela, Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (7) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Lowen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Kahaloa, Lowen, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Re-Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to GVO/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|