|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:10PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 284) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|