|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia, Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1571) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Gates, Lowen, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Pierick; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Alcos, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kapela, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 288) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1072) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-23-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 537) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to EET, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|