|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 298) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Ihara). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|