LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB919
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB919
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB919
Action History
12/11/2023
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Senate
02/08/2023
The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Senate
02/03/2023
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/27/2023
Referred to LBT, JDC/WAM.
Senate
01/23/2023
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/20/2023
Introduced.