12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |