|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1541) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 319) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS/CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-23 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|