|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 324) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to TCA, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|