House
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WAL as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1858-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3629) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to GVO/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|