House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1862-24), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 418) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from HHS/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3542) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HHS/AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|