Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 795).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1934-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1876-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) La Chica, Kapela, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-11-24 2:01PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 362) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
One Day Notice 4-3-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Waived referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3362), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-25-24 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|