Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 796).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1935-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1880-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 04-12-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 426) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3436) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|