House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1895-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 04-12-24 9:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3508) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|