House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3617) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to TCA. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |