House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 435) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3578) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |