House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 437) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3515) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Re-Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |