Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 787).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1933-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-17-24 2:00PM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1853-24), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 451) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3635) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|