Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1939-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1852-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:15AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3486) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to LBT.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|