Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 803).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 803).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 05-03-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-03-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-24; agree to House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1919-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Matayoshi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 04-12-24 9:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to CAI, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3494) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|