House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899-24), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 04-11-24 11:00AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from CPN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3623) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:38AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to CPN/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|