House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to WAL/LGO, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 461) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3631) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to GVO/WTL. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |