House
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3522) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-Referred to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-28-24 1:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|