Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 796).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-25-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-25-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 799).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1940-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1857-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3386) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Re-Referred to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|