House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 380) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3609) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to GVO. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Offered. |