Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 793).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1936-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
One Day Notice 4-3-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Waived referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3364), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|