House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 389) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3574) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Richards. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Re-Referred to HWN. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to EDU/HWN, CPN. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |