House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1877-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) La Chica, Kapela, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-11-24 2:01PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3448) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to EDU/HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|