House
|
04/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886-24), recommending referral to TRN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to WAL, TRN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3514) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-28-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|