Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3569) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to AEN/EET. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |