Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3485) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:32AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |