Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from AEN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3581) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Re-Referred to AEN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to AEN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |