Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3565) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to EET. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |